AL SB115 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-02 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-02 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public assistance, fraudulent means to establish eligibility, prohibited, penalties
Title
Public assistance, fraudulent means to establish eligibility, prohibited, penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Further Consideration | |
2011-06-02 | Gaston motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2011-05-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-28 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government | |
2011-04-27 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 437 | |
2011-04-27 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-03 | Reported from Finance and Taxation General Fund as Favorable | |
2011-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |