AL SB114 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation
Pending: House Jefferson County Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation
Pending: House Jefferson County Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Jefferson Co., retirement system for county employees, reemployment with county, benefits not reduced if reemployed two years after retirement or after two years of reemployment, certain provisions for reduction amended and repealed, Sec. 45-37-123.54 am'd; Sec. 45-37-123.105 repealed
Title
Jefferson Co., retirement system for county employees, reemployment with county, benefits not reduced if reemployed two years after retirement or after two years of reemployment, certain provisions for reduction amended and repealed, Sec. 45-37-123.54 am'd; Sec. 45-37-123.105 repealed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 411 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 410 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 410 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 411 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Jefferson County Legislation |
Same As/Similar To
HB152 (Same As) 2022-03-29 - Forwarded to Governor at 5:25 p.m. on March 29, 2022.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 37 | 123.105 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 37 | 123.54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |