AL SB114 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Health
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Nurses, certified registered nurse practioner and nurse midwife, collaboration agreements, ratio of physician to nurses, delete patient auth. to select provided, Sec. 34-21-87 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nurses, certified registered nurse practioner and nurse midwife, collaboration agreements, ratio of physician to nurses, delete patient auth. to select provided, Sec. 34-21-87 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - McClendon motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - McClendon motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HousePending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Health
2020-03-12HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2020-03-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
2020-03-05SenateEngrossed
2020-03-05SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 288
2020-03-05SenateMcClendon motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 287
2020-03-05SenateMcClendon Amendment Offered
2020-03-05SenateMcClendon motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 286
2020-03-05SenateHealthcare first Substitute Offered
2020-03-05SenateThird Reading Passed
2020-02-20SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2020-02-04SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB114&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/SB114-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/SB114-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/205269-4.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/205599-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=634686&VOTE=286&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=634688&VOTE=287&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=634689&VOTE=288&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback