AL SB114 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Delivered to Governor at 12:12 p.m. on March 22, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Delivered to Governor at 12:12 p.m. on March 22, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Plumbers and Gas Fitters Examining Board, continued until October 1, 2016, pursuant to Sunset Law
Title
Plumbers and Gas Fitters Examining Board, continued until October 1, 2016, pursuant to Sunset Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Bussman motion to Adopt (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Bussman motion to Adopt (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Delivered to Governor at 12:12 p.m. on March 22, 2012 | |
2012-03-22 | Assigned Act No. 2012-101. | |
2012-03-22 | Signature Requested | |
2012-03-22 | Enrolled | |
2012-03-22 | Passed Second House | |
2012-03-22 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 460 | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-20 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-15 | Engrossed | |
2012-03-15 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions | |
2012-03-15 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 271 | |
2012-03-15 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-14 | Unfinished Business | |
2012-03-14 | Bussman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 268 | |
2012-03-14 | Bussman first Substitute Offered | |
2012-03-14 | Unfinished Business | |
2012-02-28 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |