AL SB113 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Pending third reading on day 7 Favorable from Ways and Means General Fund
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Environmental Management Dept., centralized waste treatment facilities, permits, bond or financial assurance further provided for, provisions for fees based on cost to treat repealed, Secs. 22-25C-1, 22-25C-2 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental Management Dept., centralized waste treatment facilities, permits, bond or financial assurance further provided for, provisions for fees based on cost to treat repealed, Secs. 22-25C-1, 22-25C-2 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-23HousePending third reading on day 7 Favorable from Ways and Means General Fund
2017-02-23HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-02-14HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
2017-02-14SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 44
2017-02-14SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-02-09SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-02-07SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback