AL SB112 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Pending third reading on day 12 Favorable from Commerce and Small Business
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Pending third reading on day 12 Favorable from Commerce and Small Business
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, motor vehicle dealers, off-site sale requirements, further provided, Sec. 40-12-395 am'd.
Title
Motor vehicles, motor vehicle dealers, off-site sale requirements, further provided, Sec. 40-12-395 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 193 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt Roll Call 192 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - SBIR: Waggoner motion to Adopt Roll Call 191 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt Roll Call 192 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - SBIR: Waggoner motion to Adopt Roll Call 191 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Pending third reading on day 12 Favorable from Commerce and Small Business |
2022-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-10 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 193 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 192 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |