AL SB112 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Assigned Act No. 2018-162.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Assigned Act No. 2018-162.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Conservation and Natural Resources, game breeder's licenses, issuance, further provided for, penalties, criminal penalties applicable only for intentional violations, Secs. 9-11-30, 9-11-31.1 am'd.
Title
Conservation and Natural Resources, game breeder's licenses, issuance, further provided for, penalties, criminal penalties applicable only for intentional violations, Secs. 9-11-30, 9-11-31.1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-162. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-27 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-02-22 | House | Ainsworth intended to vote "Abstain" |
2018-02-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 460 |
2018-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Engrossed |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 53 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Sanford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 52 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Sanford Amendment Offered |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |