AL SB112 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Traffic stops, racial profiling by law enforcement officers, prohibited, written policies, forms for statistics, and reports to Attorney General required, provision for complaints

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traffic stops, racial profiling by law enforcement officers, prohibited, written policies, forms for statistics, and reports to Attorney General required, provision for complaints

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-13HousePending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security
2017-04-13HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-03-14HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
2017-03-09SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 293
2017-03-09SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-02-16SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-02-07SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback