AL SB112 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-9)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 8:04 p.m. on June 2, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-9)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 8:04 p.m. on June 2, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Poll taxes and segregation of schools by race, constitutional provisions regarding deleted, portions of Section 256 and Section 256 as amended by Amendment 111, Constitution of Alabama of 1901, (Section 256, Recompiled Constitution of Alabama of 1901, as amended), am'd., Section 259, (Section 259, Recompiled Constitution of Alabama of 1901, as amended), Amendment 90, and Amendment 109, Constitution of Alabama of 1901, repealed, const. amend.
Title
Poll taxes and segregation of schools by race, constitutional provisions regarding deleted, portions of Section 256 and Section 256 as amended by Amendment 111, Constitution of Alabama of 1901, (Section 256, Recompiled Constitution of Alabama of 1901, as amended), am'd., Section 259, (Section 259, Recompiled Constitution of Alabama of 1901, as amended), Amendment 90, and Amendment 109, Constitution of Alabama of 1901, repealed, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 67 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Williams (P) motion to Table (Y: 60 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Williams (P) motion to Table (Y: 62 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Williams (P) motion to Table (Y: 64 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Williams (P) motion to Table (Y: 60 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Williams (P) motion to Table (Y: 62 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Williams (P) motion to Table (Y: 64 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Secretary of State at 8:04 p.m. on June 2, 2011 | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-353. | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1121 | |
2011-06-02 | Williams (P) motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1120 | |
2011-06-02 | Holmes Amendment Offered | |
2011-06-02 | Williams (P) motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1119 | |
2011-06-02 | Rogers Amendment Offered | |
2011-06-02 | Williams (P) motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1110 | |
2011-06-02 | Buskey Amendment Offered | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-24 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Engrossed | |
2011-04-27 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-27 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 410 | |
2011-04-27 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 409 | |
2011-04-27 | Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 408. | |
2011-04-27 | Orr Amendment Offered | |
2011-04-27 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections |