AL SB111 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - Pending third reading on day 16 Favorable from County and Municipal Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - Pending third reading on day 16 Favorable from County and Municipal Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Class 8 municipalities, weeds, abatement, alternative procedures to declare a public nuisance after prior abatement
Title
Class 8 municipalities, weeds, abatement, alternative procedures to declare a public nuisance after prior abatement
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | House | Pending third reading on day 16 Favorable from County and Municipal Government |
2017-04-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-03-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 416 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 415 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | County and Municipal Government Amendment Offered |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on County and Municipal Government |