AL SB11 | 2016 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-18 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Judicial Inquiry Commission and Court of the Judiciary, abolished, const. amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Judicial Inquiry Commission and Court of the Judiciary, abolished, const. amend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-18 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition To Cease Debate (Y: 11 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-18SenateFurther Consideration
2016-08-18SenateMarsh motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2016-08-18SenateRules Committee Petition To Cease Debate Lost Roll Call 18
2016-08-18SenateMcClendon second Substitute Offered
2016-08-18SenateMcClendon first Substitute Offered
2016-08-18SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2016-08-17SenateMarsh motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2016-08-17SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2016-08-17Senate***Per Committee Chairman, the vote was corrected to a 7 yeas, 1 nay vote
2016-08-16SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-08-15SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism and Marketing

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback