AL SB11 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Health, suicide prevention, K-12, annual education training, Jason Flatt Act, established

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health, suicide prevention, K-12, annual education training, Jason Flatt Act, established

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Allen motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-03SenateEngrossed
2016-05-03SenateAssigned Act No. 2016-310.
2016-05-03HouseSignature Requested
2016-05-03SenateEnrolled
2016-05-03SenatePassed Second House
2016-04-28HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 803
2016-04-28HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-04-28HouseGaston motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2016-04-28HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2016-04-07HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-03-15HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
2016-03-15SenateEngrossed
2016-03-15SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 408
2016-03-15SenatePittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 407
2016-03-15SenatePittman Amendment Offered
2016-03-15SenateAllen motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 406
2016-03-15SenateEducation and Youth Affairs first Substitute Offered
2016-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-03-08SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2016-02-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback