AL SB11 | 2015 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Class 2 municipalities (Mobile), redevelopment authorities, establishment for financing redevelopment projects under certain conditions, issuance of bonds, tax exempt status, Secs. 11-54C-1 to 11-54C-25, inclusive, added

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Class 2 municipalities (Mobile), redevelopment authorities, establishment for financing redevelopment projects under certain conditions, issuance of bonds, tax exempt status, Secs. 11-54C-1 to 11-54C-25, inclusive, added

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 51 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2015-09-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 41 Abs: 44) [FAIL]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-16Senate
2015-09-16HouseMobile County Legislation Amendment Offered
2015-09-16HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 66
2015-09-16HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 65
2015-09-16HouseMobile County Legislation Amendment Offered
2015-09-16HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-09-15HouseSessions motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2015-09-15HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2015-09-14HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2015-09-10HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Mobile County Legislation
2015-09-10SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 8
2015-09-10SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-09-09SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar w/sub
2015-09-08SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Mobile County

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback