AL SB11 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Conference Committee Appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Conference Committee Appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Legislative Council, reconstituted, Senate Legislative Council, House Legislative Council estab., Legislative Council, Joint Fiscal Committee, Legislative Building Authority, Permanent Legislative Committee on Reapportionment Committee abolished, Law Institute part of Legislative Department, Chief of Legislative Operations created, Secs. 29-1-5, 29-1-22, 29-2-52, 29-2-200, 29-2-201, 29-4-20, 29-4-22, 29-4-25, 29-4-30, 29-4-32, 29-4-35, 29-4-40, 29-4-42, 29-5-2, 29-5-3, 29-5-4, 29-5-13, 29-6-1, 29-6-2, 29-6-3, 29-6-4, 29-6-7, 29-7-4, 29-8-1,29-8-2, 29-8-3, 29-8-4, 29-8-5, 41-19-3, 41-19-3.1 am'd.; Secs. 29-6-8, 29-6-9 added; Secs. 29-2-50, 29-2-51, 29-7-5 repealed
Title
Legislative Council, reconstituted, Senate Legislative Council, House Legislative Council estab., Legislative Council, Joint Fiscal Committee, Legislative Building Authority, Permanent Legislative Committee on Reapportionment Committee abolished, Law Institute part of Legislative Department, Chief of Legislative Operations created, Secs. 29-1-5, 29-1-22, 29-2-52, 29-2-200, 29-2-201, 29-4-20, 29-4-22, 29-4-25, 29-4-30, 29-4-32, 29-4-35, 29-4-40, 29-4-42, 29-5-2, 29-5-3, 29-5-4, 29-5-13, 29-6-1, 29-6-2, 29-6-3, 29-6-4, 29-6-7, 29-7-4, 29-8-1,29-8-2, 29-8-3, 29-8-4, 29-8-5, 41-19-3, 41-19-3.1 am'd.; Secs. 29-6-8, 29-6-9 added; Secs. 29-2-50, 29-2-51, 29-7-5 repealed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - Ball motion to Accede (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 67 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Holley Table Holley to Reconsider (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Reed motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Holley motion to Table (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Ross motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Holley motion to Table (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 67 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Holley Table Holley to Reconsider (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Reed motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Holley motion to Table (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Ross motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Holley motion to Table (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2014-04-02 | House | Ball motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1079 House appoints Ball, Boothe and Scott |
2014-04-02 | House | Conference Committee Requested |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1120 P&PO appoints Holley, Orr and Smitherman |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Marsh motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Marsh motion to Reconsider nonconcurrence vote adopted Voice Vote . |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1004 P&PO appoints Holley, Orr and Smitherman |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Conference Committee Requested |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2014-03-20 | House | Greeson intended to vote "Nay" |
2014-03-20 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 916 |
2014-03-20 | House | Ball Motion to withdraw his amendment adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-20 | House | Ball Amendment Offered |
2014-03-20 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 915 |
2014-03-20 | House | Internal Affairs 3rd Amendment Offered |
2014-03-20 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 914 |
2014-03-20 | House | Internal Affairs 2nd Amendment Offered |
2014-03-20 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 913 |
2014-03-20 | House | Internal Affairs 1st Amendment Offered |
2014-03-20 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 912 |
2014-03-20 | House | Internal Affairs first Substitute Offered |
2014-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-13 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 3 amendments |
2014-01-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Internal Affairs |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Engrossed |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Holley Table Holley to Reconsider adopted Roll Call 86 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 85 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 84 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Reed motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 83 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Reed Amendment Offered |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Holley motion to Table adopted Roll Call 82 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Figures Amendment Offered |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Ross motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 81 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Ross Amendment Offered |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Holley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 80 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Holley Amendment Offered |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Holley motion to Table adopted Roll Call 79 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |