AL SB108 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-20 - Assigned Act No. 2018-145.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-20 - Assigned Act No. 2018-145.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lowdes Co., sheriff, comp. increases validated, retroactive, expenses allowance and comp.
Title
Lowdes Co., sheriff, comp. increases validated, retroactive, expenses allowance and comp.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 65 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-145. |
2018-02-20 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-02-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 339 |
2018-02-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-13 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 330 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Singleton motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |