AL SB108 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Assigned Act No. 2017-340.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Elections, primary runoff elections, voter prohibited from switching parties between primary elections

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections, primary runoff elections, voter prohibited from switching parties between primary elections

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - Senate - Whatley motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 69 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 47 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-05-16 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - Williams (JD) motion to Table (Y: 36 N: 51 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Whatley motion to Table (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Whatley motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenateAssigned Act No. 2017-340.
2017-05-18SenateEnrolled
2017-05-18HouseSignature Requested
2017-05-18HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2017-05-18SenateWhatley motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1274
2017-05-18SenateConcurrence Requested
2017-05-16HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 882
2017-05-16HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 881
2017-05-16HouseLedbetter motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 880
2017-05-16HouseWilliams (JD) motion to Table lost Roll Call 879
2017-05-16HouseConstitution, Campaigns and Elections Amendment Offered
2017-05-16HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-05-04HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2017-04-18HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
2017-04-18SenateEngrossed
2017-04-18SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 640
2017-04-18SenateRules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 639
2017-04-18SenateWhatley motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2017-04-18SenateColeman-Madison Amendment Offered
2017-04-18SenateWhatley motion to Table adopted Roll Call 638
2017-04-18SenateColeman-Madison Amendment Offered
2017-04-18SenateWhatley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 637
2017-04-18SenateWhatley Amendment Offered
2017-04-18SenateWhatley motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2017-04-18SenateConstitution, Ethics and Elections Amendment Offered
2017-04-18SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-04-06SenateWhatley motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2017-04-06SenateConstitution, Ethics and Elections Amendment Offered
2017-04-06SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2017-03-02SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2017-02-07SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Ethics and Elections

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB108&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/SB108-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/SB108-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/183170-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/184872-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/185518-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/185520-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=569569&VOTE=637&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=569571&VOTE=638&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=569574&VOTE=639&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=569580&VOTE=640&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=576488&VOTE=879&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=576491&VOTE=880&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=576492&VOTE=881&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=576497&VOTE=882&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=578433&VOTE=1274&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback