AL SB107 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Pending third reading on day 12 Favorable from County and Municipal Government with 1 substitute and 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Municipalities, police jurisdictions may not be expended, municipal planning jurisdiction limited, audit of expenditure of fees in police jurisdiction, Secs. 11-40-10, 11-52-30 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipalities, police jurisdictions may not be expended, municipal planning jurisdiction limited, audit of expenditure of fees in police jurisdiction, Secs. 11-40-10, 11-52-30 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 115 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Elliott motion to Adopt Roll Call 114 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Elliott motion to Adopt Roll Call 113 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - SBIR: Elliott motion to Adopt Roll Call 112 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03HousePending third reading on day 12 Favorable from County and Municipal Government with 1 substitute and 1 amendment
2021-03-03HouseCounty and Municipal Government first Amendment Offered
2021-03-03HouseCounty and Municipal Government first Substitute Offered
2021-03-03HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment
2021-02-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
2021-02-09SenateEngrossed
2021-02-09SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 115
2021-02-09SenateElliott motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 114
2021-02-09SenateElliott Amendment Offered
2021-02-09SenateElliott motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 113
2021-02-09SenateGovernmental Affairs Amendment Offered
2021-02-09SenateThird Reading Passed
2021-02-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2021-02-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
114010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
115230Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB107&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB107-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB107-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/209673-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/209904-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/211152-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/211167-2.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41576.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41867.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42163.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=644140&VOTE=112&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20SB107&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=644142&VOTE=113&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=644144&VOTE=114&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=644145&VOTE=115&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback