AL SB107 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from State Government with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from State Government with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public records, use of camera or electronic device to make copies of, public officer prohibited from charging copy fee, Sec. 36-12-40 am'd.
Title
Public records, use of camera or electronic device to make copies of, public officer prohibited from charging copy fee, Sec. 36-12-40 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | House | Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from State Government with 1 amendment |
2015-05-28 | House | State Government first Amendment Offered |
2015-05-28 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-04-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 401 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Williams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 400 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Williams Amendment Offered |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 399 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 398 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 397 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |