AL SB106 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance Department, insurance producers licensure further provided for, require licensees notification of changes in addresses, Secs. 27-7-1, 27-7-5, 27-7-14.1, 27-7-17, 27-7-37, 27-8A-1, 27-8A-6 am'd; 27-7-4.4, 27-22A-1 to 27-22A-7, inclusive, added; 27-7-20, 27-7-21 repealed
Title
Insurance Department, insurance producers licensure further provided for, require licensees notification of changes in addresses, Secs. 27-7-1, 27-7-5, 27-7-14.1, 27-7-17, 27-7-37, 27-8A-1, 27-8A-6 am'd; 27-7-4.4, 27-22A-1 to 27-22A-7, inclusive, added; 27-7-20, 27-7-21 repealed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Indefinitely Postponed | |
2012-05-03 | Blackwell Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted | |
2012-05-03 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2012-02-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |