AL SB104 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Assigned Act No. 2016-316.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Medical Examiners, powers and duties of Board of Medical Examiners, rulemaking authority clarified, Sec. 34-24-53.1 added

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Examiners, powers and duties of Board of Medical Examiners, rulemaking authority clarified, Sec. 34-24-53.1 added

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-03SenateAssigned Act No. 2016-316.
2016-05-03HouseSignature Requested
2016-05-03SenateEnrolled
2016-05-03SenatePassed Second House
2016-04-28HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 807
2016-04-28HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-02-23HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-02-17HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
2016-02-17SenateEngrossed
2016-02-17SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 126
2016-02-17SenateDial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 125
2016-02-17SenateDial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 124
2016-02-17SenateHealth and Human Services Amendment Offered
2016-02-17SenateHealth and Human Services Amendment Offered
2016-02-17SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-02-11SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2016-02-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB104
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2016RS/PrintFiles/SB104-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2016RS/PrintFiles/SB104-eng.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=535167&VOTE=124&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=535169&VOTE=125&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=535171&VOTE=126&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=550667&VOTE=807&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments 750

feedback