AL SB102 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Finance Department, Purchasing Division, establishment and maintenance of statewide database for bids or proposals for public contracts, required, database accessible through Internet
Title
Finance Department, Purchasing Division, establishment and maintenance of statewide database for bids or proposals for public contracts, required, database accessible through Internet
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-31 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Indefinitely Postponed | |
2011-05-31 | Orr motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-05-31 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 818 | |
2011-05-31 | Orr first Substitute Offered | |
2011-05-31 | Orr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-05-31 | Governmental Affairs first Substitute Offered | |
2011-05-31 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2011-03-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2011-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |