AL SB101 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 1034
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 1034
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Podiatry, scope of practice expanded to include foot and ankle, Sec. 34-24-230 am'd.
Title
Podiatry, scope of practice expanded to include foot and ankle, Sec. 34-24-230 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1034 (Y: 11 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - Senate - SBIR: Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt Roll Call 915 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - SBIR: Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt Roll Call 915 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 1034 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Lost in house of origin |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Coleman-Madison motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare |