AL SB101 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Education Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Education Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Colleges and universities, local boards of education, schools prohibited from using public funds to advocate for or against ballot measures
Title
Colleges and universities, local boards of education, schools prohibited from using public funds to advocate for or against ballot measures
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Ross motion to Adopt (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Ross motion to Adopt (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | House | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Education Policy |
2017-05-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-05-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1048 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1047 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 1046 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Orr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Ross motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 876 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Ross Amendment Offered |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Orr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 527 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Education and Youth Affairs first Substitute Offered |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Youth Affairs as Favorable with 1 substitute |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs |