AL SB101 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Forwarded to Executive Department on May 10, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Forwarded to Executive Department on May 10, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Corrections Department, inmates prohibited from possessing mobile telephones, wireless communication devices, visitors, giving or selling device to inmate, prohibited, search and confiscation provisions, notice, contracts for detection, penalties
Title
Corrections Department, inmates prohibited from possessing mobile telephones, wireless communication devices, visitors, giving or selling device to inmate, prohibited, search and confiscation provisions, notice, contracts for detection, penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-11 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-06 - Senate - Allen motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-06 - Senate - Allen motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Forwarded to Executive Department on May 10, 2012 | |
2012-05-10 | Assigned Act No. 2012-464. | |
2012-05-10 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-10 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-10 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2012-05-10 | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1376 | |
2012-05-10 | Concurrence Requested | |
2012-05-10 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1503 | |
2012-05-10 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-10 | McMillan motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-10 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1500 | |
2012-05-10 | Public Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-10 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2012-05-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-05-03 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2012-05-03 | Engrossed | |
2012-05-03 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1081 | |
2012-05-03 | Allen motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1080 | |
2012-05-03 | Allen Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-03 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-03 | Allen Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted | |
2012-05-03 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2012-03-22 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |