AL SB101 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - Executive Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Municipal annexations, validated and ratified under certain conditions, Sec. 11-42-5 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipal annexations, validated and ratified under certain conditions, Sec. 11-42-5 am'd.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-22 Executive Amendment Offered
2010-04-22 Little (Z) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1187
2010-04-22 Executive Amendment Offered
2010-04-22 Forwarded to Governor on April 14, 2010 at 1:40 p.m. on April 14, 2010
2010-04-14 Enrolled
2010-04-14 Signature Requested
2010-04-13 Concurred in Second House Amendment
2010-04-13 Little (Z) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1048
2010-04-13 Concurrence Requested
2010-04-13 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 951
2010-04-13 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 950
2010-04-13 County and Municipal Government first Substitute Offered
2010-04-13 Third Reading Passed
2010-02-25 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2010-02-17 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
2010-02-17 Engrossed
2010-02-16 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 253
2010-02-16 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 252
2010-02-16 Little (Z) Amendment Offered
2010-02-16 Third Reading Passed
2010-01-14 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-01-12 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback