AL SB10 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-16 - Health second Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-16 - Health second Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Vulnerable Child Compassion and Protection Act, prohibits gender change therapy for minors, prohibits withholding of certain related information from parents
Title
Vulnerable Child Compassion and Protection Act, prohibits gender change therapy for minors, prohibits withholding of certain related information from parents
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 331 (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 330 (Y: 5 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-03-02 - Senate - SBIR: Shelnutt motion to Adopt Roll Call 302 (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 330 (Y: 5 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-03-02 - Senate - SBIR: Shelnutt motion to Adopt Roll Call 302 (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | Health second Amendment Offered |
2021-03-16 | House | Health first Amendment Offered |
2021-03-16 | House | Health third Amendment Offered |
2021-03-16 | House | Pending third reading on day 16 Favorable from Health with 3 amendments |
2021-03-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 3 amendments |
2021-03-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Shelnutt motion to Reconsider and Table adopted Voice Vote |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 331 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 330 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Singleton Amendment Offered |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Shelnutt motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Whatley Amendment Offered |
2021-03-02 | Senate | BILLS ON THIRD READING RESUMED |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Shelnutt motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare |