AL SB10 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-478.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-478.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Service animals, individual with a disability, rights and responsibilities for use in a public accommodation or a housing accommodation, criminal penalties for misrepresentation or denial, interference under certain conditions, Secs. 21-7-1 to 21-7-9, inclusive, am'd.
Title
Service animals, individual with a disability, rights and responsibilities for use in a public accommodation or a housing accommodation, criminal penalties for misrepresentation or denial, interference under certain conditions, Secs. 21-7-1 to 21-7-9, inclusive, am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Fridy motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Givhan motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Givhan motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-478. |
2019-05-30 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-05-30 | House | Fridy motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1222 |
2019-05-30 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 248 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Givhan motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 247 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Givhan Amendment Offered |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Coleman-Madison motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 196 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Judiciary first Substitute Offered |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |