AL SB10 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Assigned Act No. 2018-398.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Home Builders Licensure Board, residential home builders, proof of current licensure and liability insurance provided to homeowner before beginning construction

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home Builders Licensure Board, residential home builders, proof of current licensure and liability insurance provided to homeowner before beginning construction

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-398.
2018-03-22HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-22SenateEnrolled
2018-03-21SenatePassed Second House
2018-03-21HouseDaniels intended to vote "Yea"
2018-03-21HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 958
2018-03-21HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-08HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-23HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
2018-01-23SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 50
2018-01-23SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-01-16SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback