AL SB10 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Manufacturers and dealers of boats, boat trailers, add'l authorization to provide temporary license plates and registration certificates, when sold out of state, Sec. 32-6-212 am'd.
Title
Manufacturers and dealers of boats, boat trailers, add'l authorization to provide temporary license plates and registration certificates, when sold out of state, Sec. 32-6-212 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | House | Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |
2017-03-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 203 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy |