AL SB10 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Assigned Act No. 2014-372.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Assigned Act No. 2014-372.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Foundation for Local Schools, dissolved and monies disbursed to local schools and trust accounts, Secs. 16-26C-1 to 16-26C-13 repealed
Title
Foundation for Local Schools, dissolved and monies disbursed to local schools and trust accounts, Secs. 16-26C-1 to 16-26C-13 repealed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2014-372. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-04-01 | House | Signature Requested |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2014-04-01 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 990 |
2014-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-05 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-12 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 340 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Taxation Education as Favorable |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |