AL SB10 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 2:57 p.m. on May 9, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Delivered to Governor at 2:57 p.m. on May 9, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health, abortion coverage by exchange participating health plans, State of Alabama opts out of authorizing, Federal Abortion Mandate Opt Out Act
Title
Health, abortion coverage by exchange participating health plans, State of Alabama opts out of authorizing, Federal Abortion Mandate Opt Out Act
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Reed [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 76 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Coleman motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Coleman motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Delivered to Governor at 2:57 p.m. on May 9, 2012 | |
2012-05-09 | Assigned Act No. 2012-405. | |
2012-05-09 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-09 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-09 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-08 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1357 | |
2012-05-08 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-02 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-24 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health | |
2012-04-24 | Engrossed | |
2012-04-24 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 724 | |
2012-04-24 | Coleman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 723 | |
2012-04-24 | Coleman Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-24 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-16 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health |