AL SB1 | 2021 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - Assigned Act No. 2021-558.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - Assigned Act No. 2021-558.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate, districts redrawn, Sec. 29-1-2.3 repealed; Sec. 29-1-2.3 added
Title
Senate, districts redrawn, Sec. 29-1-2.3 repealed; Sec. 29-1-2.3 added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 16 (Y: 76 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 9 (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-11-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 9 (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-558. |
2021-11-03 | House | Hall Dissent Filed |
2021-11-03 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-11-03 | House | Hassell Dissent Filed |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2021-11-03 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 16 |
2021-11-03 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-11-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-11-01 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 9 |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Taxation General Fund as Favorable |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |