AL SB1 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Health
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Contact tracing, privacy protections established

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contact tracing, privacy protections established

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 232 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 231 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 230 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29HousePending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Health
2021-04-29HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-02-23HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
2021-02-23SenateEngrossed
2021-02-23SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 232
2021-02-23SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 231
2021-02-23SenateOrr Amendment Offered
2021-02-23SenateThird Reading Passed
2021-02-10SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-02-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB1&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB1-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB1-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/210219-1.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41644.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42924.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=646113&VOTE=230&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20SB1&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=646116&VOTE=231&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=646117&VOTE=232&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback