AL SB1 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Forwarded to Governor at 1:00 p.m. on March 29, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Driving under the influence, ignition interlock devices, further provided, distrib of court fees, use for pretrial diversion, indigents further provided for and funded, Sec. 32-5A-191, 32-5A-191.4 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driving under the influence, ignition interlock devices, further provided, distrib of court fees, use for pretrial diversion, indigents further provided for and funded, Sec. 32-5A-191, 32-5A-191.4 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - Mooney motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 78 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - Mooney motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - McClendon motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - McClendon motion to Accede (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - Mooney motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - McClendon motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - Mooney motion to Accede (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - McClendon motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Mooney motion to Table (Y: 24 N: 64 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - McClendon motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - McClendon motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - McClendon motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29SenateForwarded to Governor at 1:00 p.m. on March 29, 2018
2018-03-29HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-517.
2018-03-29SenateConference Committee on SB1 2018RS first Substitute Offered
2018-03-29HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-29SenateEnrolled
2018-03-29HouseColeman intended to vote "Nay"
2018-03-29SenateConcurred in Conference Report
2018-03-29HouseMooney motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1105
2018-03-29HouseConference Report Concurrence Requested
2018-03-28SenateMcClendon motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1242
2018-03-28HouseConference Report
2018-03-28HouseConference Committee Appointed
2018-03-28SenateMcClendon motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1234 P&PO appoints McClendon, Bussman and Smitherman
2018-03-28SenateConference Committee Requested
2018-03-28HouseMooney motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1090 House appoints Mooney, Farley and Morrow
2018-03-28HouseConference Report Concurrence Requested
2018-03-27SenateMcClendon motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1161
2018-03-27SenateConference Report
2018-03-21SenateConference Committee Appointed
2018-03-21HouseMooney motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 942 House appoints Mooney, Farley and Morrow
2018-03-21HouseConference Committee Requested
2018-03-21SenateMcClendon motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 926 P&PO appoints McClendon, Bussman and Smitherman
2018-03-21SenateConcurrence Requested
2018-03-20HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 920
2018-03-20HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 919
2018-03-20HouseMooney motion to Table lost Roll Call 918
2018-03-20HouseEngland Amendment Offered
2018-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-08HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-01HouseReferred from Judiciary to Public Safety and Homeland Security
2018-01-30HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2018-01-30SenateEngrossed
2018-01-25SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 160
2018-01-25SenateMcClendon motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 159
2018-01-25SenateMcClendon Amendment Offered
2018-01-25SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-01-25SenateMcClendon motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-01-25SenateMcClendon motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 151
2018-01-25SenateMcClendon Amendment Offered
2018-01-25SenateMcClendon motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 150
2018-01-25SenateMcClendon Amendment Offered
2018-01-25SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-01-11SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB1&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB1-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB1-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB1-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/189865-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/190603-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/190602-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/192797-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/193840-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/194096-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=583665&VOTE=150&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=583667&VOTE=151&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=583695&VOTE=159&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=583696&VOTE=160&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=598174&VOTE=918&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=598175&VOTE=919&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=598176&VOTE=920&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=598348&VOTE=926&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=598603&VOTE=942&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=601292&VOTE=1161&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=602237&VOTE=1090&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=602281&VOTE=1234&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=602451&VOTE=1242&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=602771&VOTE=1106&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=602771&VOTE=1105&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback