AL SB1 | 2016 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-24 - Assigned Act No. 2016-465.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-24 - Assigned Act No. 2016-465.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Civil Rights, privacy, public rest rooms gender appropriate, Alabama Privacy Act established
Title
Civil Rights, privacy, public rest rooms gender appropriate, Alabama Privacy Act established
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Dial [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-24 - House - Fincher motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Senate - Dial motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 78 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2016-08-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Senate - Dial motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 78 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2016-08-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-24 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2016-465. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Second House Concurs in Executive Amendment |
2016-08-24 | House | Mooney intended to vote "Yea" |
2016-08-25 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-08-24 | House | Fincher motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 55 |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Dial motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 56 |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Executive Amendment Offered |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-08-19 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2016-08-19 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 39 |
2016-08-19 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-08-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-08-17 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2016-08-17 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 8 |
2016-08-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |