AL SB1 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Conference Committee Appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Conference Committee Appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama Ahead Act, commencing with 2015-2016 school year, to delete pen-enabled requirement, phase-in requirement and reassignment provisions, advisory committee revised, schools participation voluntary, local school systems to contribute 25 percent of funding, Section 14 of Act 2012-560, 2012 Reg. Sess., am'd; Secs. 16-16B-1, 16-16B-2 am'd.
Title
Alabama Ahead Act, commencing with 2015-2016 school year, to delete pen-enabled requirement, phase-in requirement and reassignment provisions, advisory committee revised, schools participation voluntary, local school systems to contribute 25 percent of funding, Section 14 of Act 2012-560, 2012 Reg. Sess., am'd; Secs. 16-16B-1, 16-16B-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Dial [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - House - Poole motion to Accede (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-06-02 | House | Poole motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1201 House appoints Poole, Williams (P) and Scott |
2015-06-02 | House | Conference Committee Requested |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1292 P&PO appoints Dial, McClendon and Smitherman |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2015-05-28 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1150 |
2015-05-28 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1149 |
2015-05-28 | House | Ways and Means Education first Substitute Offered |
2015-05-28 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-07 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2015-03-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 127 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 126 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education fourth Amendment Offered |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 125 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education third Amendment Offered |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 124 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education second Amendment Offered |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 123 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 122 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education first Substitute Offered |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 4 amendments |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |