AL HR376 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Joint Rule 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Joint Rule 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Major League Baseball Players Alumni Association on the occasion of its 2nd Youth Baseball Clinic. - Commending
Title
Major League Baseball Players Alumni Association on the occasion of its 2nd Youth Baseball Clinic. - Commending
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - House - Hill motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Albritton motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Albritton motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | House | Joint Rule 11 |