AL HJR95 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Assigned Act No. 2011-59.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Assigned Act No. 2011-59.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fendley, Bobby Joe, death mourned
Title
Fendley, Bobby Joe, death mourned
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Ford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Assigned Act No. 2011-59. | |
2011-03-24 | Delivered to Governor at 4:00 p.m. on March 24, 2011. | |
2011-03-24 | Enrolled | |
2011-03-24 | Signature Requested | |
2011-03-24 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-03-24 | Passed Second House | |
2011-03-24 | Beason motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-03-24 | Reported from Rules | |
2011-03-24 | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules | |
2011-03-22 | Galliher motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-03-22 | Reported from Rules | |
2011-03-09 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |