AL HJR81 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Delivered to Governor at 2:24 p.m. on April 14, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Delivered to Governor at 2:24 p.m. on April 14, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Officer Joseph Jerome Daniels Memorial Highway, portion of Interstate Highway 65 North, City of Birmingham, named
Title
Officer Joseph Jerome Daniels Memorial Highway, portion of Interstate Highway 65 North, City of Birmingham, named
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:24 p.m. on April 14, 2015. |
2015-04-14 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-62. |
2015-04-14 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-04-09 | House | Enrolled |
2015-04-09 | House | Passed Second House |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2015-04-07 | House | McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2015-04-07 | House | Reported from Rules |
2015-03-31 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |