AL HJR788 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Delivered to Governor at 1:20 p.m. on April 14, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Delivered to Governor at 1:20 p.m. on April 14, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Don Sutton Highway, Alabama Highway 10 between the Pike County line and the city limits of Clio, named
Title
Don Sutton Highway, Alabama Highway 10 between the Pike County line and the city limits of Clio, named
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Delivered to Governor at 1:20 p.m. on April 14, 2010. | |
2010-04-14 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-14 | Assigned Act No. 2010-445. | |
2010-04-14 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-04-14 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-13 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-13 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-13 | Barron motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-04-13 | Reported from Rules | |
2010-04-08 | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules | |
2010-04-06 | Guin motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-04-06 | Reported from Rules | |
2010-04-01 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |