AL HJR78 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Delivered to Governor at 4:42 p.m. on May 2, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Teacher Academic Freedom, urged to teach scientific evidence subjects

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teacher Academic Freedom, urged to teach scientific evidence subjects

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02HouseDelivered to Governor at 4:42 p.m. on May 2, 2017.
2017-05-02HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-235.
2017-05-02HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-05-02HouseEnrolled
2017-05-02SenateSignature Requested
2017-05-02HousePassed Second House
2017-05-02SenateWaggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2017-05-02SenateReported from Rules
2017-04-06SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2017-04-06HouseBoothe motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2017-04-06HouseReported from Rules
2017-02-23HouseIntroduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback