AL HJR71 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Assigned Act No. 2018-115.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Assigned Act No. 2018-115.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Television service providers, urged to provide Alabama citizens with access to programming that originates in Alabama
Title
Television service providers, urged to provide Alabama citizens with access to programming that originates in Alabama
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Fincher [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-115. |
2018-02-15 | House | Forwarded to Governor on February 15, 2018 at 2:55 p.m. on February 15, 2018. |
2018-02-15 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-02-15 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2018-01-23 | House | Jones motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2018-01-23 | House | Reported from Rules and received |
2018-01-16 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |