AL HJR7 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-16 - Assigned Act No. 2018-5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Military veterans, recognized

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military veterans, recognized

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-16HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-5.
2018-01-16HouseDelivered to Governor at 2:10 p.m. on January 16, 2018.
2018-01-16HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-01-11HouseEnrolled
2018-01-11HousePassed Second House
2018-01-11SenateWaggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2018-01-11SenateReported from Rules
2018-01-09SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2018-01-09HouseMoore (B) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback