AL HJR69 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Delivered to Governor at 3:26 p.m. on May 18, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Crisis Diversion Centers, established, to provide behavioral health crisis services

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crisis Diversion Centers, established, to provide behavioral health crisis services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-18HouseDelivered to Governor at 3:26 p.m. on May 18, 2020.
2020-05-18HouseClerk of the House Certification
2020-05-18SenateSignature Requested
2020-05-18HouseEnrolled
2020-05-18HousePassed Second House
2020-05-18SenateOrr motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2020-05-18SenateReported from Rules
2020-03-05SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2020-03-05HouseJones (M) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2020-03-05HouseReported from Rules
2020-02-27HouseIntroduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback