AL HJR62 | 2016 | 1st Special Session


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-06 - Rules first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]


Joint Legislative Task Force on Budget Reform, created

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Joint Legislative Task Force on Budget Reform, created


Roll Calls

2016-09-06 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]


2016-09-06HouseRules first Substitute Offered
2016-09-06HouseForwarded to Governor on September 6, 2016 at 3:21 p.m. on September 6, 2016.
2016-09-06HouseAssigned Act No. 2016-480.
2016-09-06HouseClerk of the House Certification
2016-09-06SenateSignature Requested
2016-09-06HousePassed Second House
2016-09-06SenateMarsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 75
2016-09-06SenateReceived in Senate
2016-08-26SenateRoss motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2016-08-26SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2016-08-25HouseJohnson (R) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2016-08-25HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2016-08-26SenateReported from Rules and carried over to call of the chair
2016-08-25HouseRules Substitute Offered
2016-08-25HouseReported from Rules with 1 substitute and
2016-08-24HouseIntroduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules


Alabama State Sources

Bill Comments