AL HJR528 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Delivered to Governor at 2:10 p.m. on May 24, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Delivered to Governor at 2:10 p.m. on May 24, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
President Barack Obama, U.S. National Security Team, Navy SEALs, commended
Title
President Barack Obama, U.S. National Security Team, Navy SEALs, commended
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | Delivered to Governor at 2:10 p.m. on May 24, 2011. | |
2011-05-24 | Assigned Act No. 2011-280. | |
2011-05-24 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-05-24 | Signature Requested | |
2011-05-24 | Enrolled | |
2011-05-24 | Passed Second House | |
2011-05-05 | Beason motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-05-05 | Reported from Rules | |
2011-05-05 | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules | |
2011-05-05 | Galliher motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-05-05 | Reported from Rules | |
2011-05-04 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |