AL HJR50 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on February 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-26 - Delivered to Governor at 3:37 p.m. on February 26, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on February 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-26 - Delivered to Governor at 3:37 p.m. on February 26, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ritch, Joe H., commended
Title
Ritch, Joe H., commended
Sponsors
Rep. Howard Sanderford [R] | Rep. Mac McCutcheon [R] | Rep. Jim Patterson [R] | Rep. Laura Hall [D] |
Rep. Phil Williams [R] | Rep. Wayne Johnson [R] | Rep. Mike Ball [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:37 p.m. on February 26, 2013. |
2013-02-26 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-37. |
2013-02-26 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-26 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2013-02-19 | House | McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2013-02-19 | House | Reported from Rules |
2013-02-14 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |