AL HJR479 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Delivered to Governor at 7:20 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Rosser, Tolton C., commended

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rosser, Tolton C., commended

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03HouseDelivered to Governor at 7:20 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
2014-04-03HouseAssigned Act No. 2014-367.
2014-04-03HouseClerk of the House Certification
2014-04-03SenateSignature Requested
2014-04-03HouseEnrolled
2014-04-03HousePassed Second House
2014-04-03SenateWaggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2014-04-03SenateReported from Rules
2014-04-03SenateReceived in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
2014-04-02HouseMcCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2014-04-02HouseReported from Rules
2014-04-01HouseIntroduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback