AL HJR472 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 5:24 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 5:24 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Improve the health and productivity of citizens, state agencies urged to implement recommendations of National Academy of Sciences
Title
Improve the health and productivity of citizens, state agencies urged to implement recommendations of National Academy of Sciences
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Delivered to Governor at 5:24 p. m. on May 16, 2012. | |
2012-05-16 | Assigned Act No. 2012-591. | |
2012-05-16 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-16 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-16 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-16 | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-16 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-05-10 | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules | |
2012-05-10 | Galliher motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-10 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-05-09 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |