AL HJR462 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-17)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Forwarded to Governor on May 16, 2012 at 12:43 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-17)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Forwarded to Governor on May 16, 2012 at 12:43 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Navy SEALS Team Six, and all members of the United States Armed Forces, commended
Title
Navy SEALS Team Six, and all members of the United States Armed Forces, commended
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Forwarded to Governor on May 16, 2012 at 12:43 p. m. on May 16, 2012. | |
2012-05-16 | Assigned Act No. 2012-571. | |
2012-05-16 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-16 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-16 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-16 | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-16 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-05-09 | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules | |
2012-05-09 | Galliher motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-09 | Reported from Rules | |
2012-05-08 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |